It looks like you're using an Ad Blocker.

Please white-list or disable AboveTopSecret.com in your ad-blocking tool.

Thank you.

 

Some features of ATS will be disabled while you continue to use an ad-blocker.

 

Vedic Maths

page: 1
2

log in

join
share:

posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 07:14 AM
link   
Vedic Maths was first started by Indian Sages. It is a method of Maths that involves short cuts in calculations. Here is an example of one of the formulas:

Multipying two numbers in which the first two digits add to ten, and the second digits are the same. e.g

62 * 68 :

Add 1 to the 6 -

72 * 68

8 * 2 = 16
7* 6 = 42

Therefore : 62 * 68 = 4216

In the same way -

55 * 55 = 3025
83 * 87 = 7221
41 * 49 = 2009

e.t.c


The method above is not very clear, but if you want to learn more about Vedic Maths, either send me a reply, or do a google search.




posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 07:38 AM
link   
So you just add 1 to the last position in the first number. Multiply the corrosponding places with eachother and combine the answers to get the big answer? Can this be used in any other mathmatical calculations besides simple multiplication that can be done with a calculator? No sarcasm intended there.

I have actually never heard of 'vedic' mathmatics before.



posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 08:17 AM
link   
I dont get it...
can you give another example.

you said...
---------------
Multipying two numbers in which the first two digits add to ten, and the second digits are the same. e.g

62 * 68 :
-----------------
first two digits add to ten...6+2 is 8

maybe this can be explained in a different way.
Im all for learning an easier way to do math.



posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 11:06 AM
link   
Sorry I wasnt very clear....

The first 2 digits in the example :

62 * 68

are 2 and 8, which add to ten -- 2+8 = 10

The second digits are the same : 6 and 6 in the 62 and the 68



posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 11:07 AM
link   
Simultaneous equations and many other areas in Maths can be performed using Vedic Maths



posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 11:15 AM
link   

Originally posted by siddharthsma
Sorry I wasnt very clear....

The first 2 digits in the example :

62 * 68

are 2 and 8, which add to ten -- 2+8 = 10

The second digits are the same : 6 and 6 in the 62 and the 68


cool, got it now...

to bad this doesnt work for all numbers.



posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 11:31 AM
link   
Perhaps provide some links to papers on this or other sites with the technique?

For the record, the Hindu branch of mathematics included some fairly sophisticated concepts that weren't discovered/used in the West until much later than the Indian discoveries.

Erm, no, I don't remember which ones and no, they weren't mentioned by Indigo Child, but I did encounter some mention of them in a mathematics text recently.



posted on Apr, 16 2005 @ 03:30 PM
link   
There are all sorts of tricks for learning to multiply numbers in your head. Some of them were apparently written down in ancient indian texts. There are also special algorithms, that computers use for multiplying large numbers.

The story I heard is that some guy published a book about a bunch of math tricks, based on vedic texts. Although, there have also been published accounts in the west about such tricks for at least a couple hundred years.

However, the greatest trick of all is that decimal number system. It is also sometimes advantageous if you can convert to other number systems in your head.



posted on Apr, 17 2005 @ 07:32 AM
link   
Criss- Cross Technique :

Here is the Formula : * = MUTLIPLICATION sIGN

A B
* X Y
_______________
AX / (AY + BX) / BY

An Example : 68 * 48

6 8
* 4 8
_____________
24 / ( 48 + 32 ) / 64

24 / 80 / 64

Add the 8 in the 80 to the 24 = 32

3264



posted on Apr, 17 2005 @ 07:37 AM
link   
8 7
* 6 8
_________
48 / ( 64 + 42 ) / 56

48 / 106 / 56

Add the 5 in 56 to the 106

48 / 111 / 06

Add the 11 in 111 to 48

59 / 001 / 06

Ignore 0's

Answer = 5916



posted on Apr, 17 2005 @ 07:39 AM
link   
Reply if you still dont understand the Criss Cross Technique



posted on Apr, 17 2005 @ 07:42 AM
link   
There are hundreds of techniques in Vedic Maths. They are useful in Time straining exams.



posted on Jun, 18 2008 @ 07:27 AM
link   



posted on Jun, 18 2008 @ 07:34 AM
link   
Vedic math is amazing.
I would advocate its introduction in all schools.

P.S. Why is this in the "Conspiracy" forum?

Why not in a "civilisation" or even "humanities" one?







[edit on 18-6-2008 by Vanitas]



posted on Jul, 30 2008 @ 06:16 AM
link   
thought I would bump this thread, since I did the right thing and used the search feature before posting...

although mods may want to move to appropriate forum.

Vedic math is based on 16 principles (sutras). It still uses math, but there are lots of shortcuts.

For example, multiple any number by 9, and the digits of the solution will also add up to 9 (or a multiple of 9).

e.g. 5x9 = 45. 4+5=9.
and: 73x9 = 657. 6+5+7 = 18. (and 1+8=9)

So instead of actually doing the traditional concept of math in your head, it's a bit different; more like translating a language I guess. Some people confuse it with numerology, which it is not.

There's another method for adding times very easily, not sure which sutra it is (or if it has its sutra).

basically when adding times, say 1:27 and 5:44, you have to convert the times to seconds, or at least do some mental math to deal with the 60/100 denominator difference... however there is a "magic time" number with a constant value of 40 that takes that entire step out. Instead of converting the time, you just bunch the numbers together, add, and then add 40. Hard to explain, easy to illustrate:

instead of this process:
1:27 = (1x60)+27 = 60+27 = 87
5:44 = (5x60)+44 = 300+44 = 344
87 + 344 = 431
431/60 = 7 r11
7:11

you do this:
1:27 = 127
5:44 = 544
127 + 544 = 671
671 + 40 = 711
711 = 7:11

admittedly, each of those have 5 steps... but clearly the second version was much easier. 3 steps involved removing or adding a colon, with only 2 actual steps with very simple addition. This would be at most a 2-step mental process.

The typical (western) method can be done mentally as well, but it takes a bit longer, since you have to do a variety of mental calculations.

Just some very small examples of vedic math opposed to western math. I firmly believe that if I was taught both methods in school, I would have ended up keeping an active interest in math, instead of having it beaten out of me with long, boring equations. I'll stop before a rant ensues.

Hope some of you find this interesting, and better yet, I hope it sparks a new interest in math to some of you that may have lost it like I had at one point, or to those of you that never considered yourselves good at math. This is an entirely new approach.



posted on Jul, 30 2008 @ 06:24 AM
link   
thats pretty good math for the time frame
astounding



new topics

top topics



 
2

log in

join